OR SB900 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Effective date, August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon Health Authority to be responsible for posting to its website health care price data for inpatient and outpatient hospital services. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health care price data; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-03 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-13SenateEffective date, August 12, 2015.
2015-08-13SenateChapter 845, 2015 Laws.
2015-08-12SenateGovernor signed.
2015-07-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-08SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-06SenateRules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Riley, Shields, Steiner Hayward.
2015-07-06HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Lively. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Buehler.
2015-07-06HouseSecond reading.
2015-07-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed.
2015-07-03HouseWork Session held.
2015-07-01HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-07-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2015-07-01SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 2--Shields, Steiner Hayward; excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Olsen.
2015-07-01SenateSecond reading.
2015-06-30SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2015-06-29SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-23SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-23SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-08SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-06-03SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2015-04-13SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2015-04-13SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2015-04-08SenateWork Session held.
2015-03-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-03-06SenateReferred to Health Care.
2015-03-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB900
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB900/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB900/Senate%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB900/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB900/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB900/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB900/House%20Amendments%20to%20B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB900/C-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB900/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21477
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23302
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=363824
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23439
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364928
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=365078

Bill Comments

feedback