OR SB90 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 513, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 513, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers information technology security functions of certain state agencies in executive branch to State Chief Information Officer. Establishes Oregon Cybersecurity Advisory Council in office of State Chief Information Officer. Directs State Chief Information Officer to develop plan for establishment of Oregon Cybersecurity Center of Excellence and submit plan to committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than January 1, 2019. Authorizes State Chief Information Officer to enter into certain agreements and accept certain funds. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to information technology security; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-04 | Senate | Chapter 513, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2017. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed.Ayes, 49; Nays, 5--Hayden, Heard, Parrish, Post, Reschke; Excused, 5--Bentz, Boone, Hernandez, Nearman, Whisnant; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 19, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-14 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-06-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-06-07 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by DeBoer, Riley. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill. (Printed C-Eng.) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Legislative Information Management and Technology and then Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Accountability, then Legislative Information Management and Technology, then Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |