OR SB892 | 2021 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Effective date, December 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Effective date, December 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Department of Agriculture to establish forgivable loan program to provide financial assistance to farming and ranching producers in Oregon with lost gross farm income in calendar year 2021 due to qualifying natural disaster. Directs State Department of Agriculture to establish forgivable loan program to provide financial assistance to farming and ranching producers in Oregon with lost gross farm income in calendar year 2021 due to qualifying natural disaster. Sunsets July 1, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to financial assistance for agricultural producers; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-17 | Senate | Effective date, December 14, 2021. |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Chapter 2, 2021 Laws. |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-12-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-12-13 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Smith G. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Goodwin, Scharf, Wilde, Williams, Zika. |
2021-12-13 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2021-12-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to The Second Special Session of 2021. |
2021-12-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Findley, Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Boquist, Robinson. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Referred to The Second Special Session of 2021. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |