OR SB89 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs state agencies to assign certain liquidated and delinquent accounts to Department of Revenue for collection. Directs department to contract with private collection agencies to collect on accounts. Deletes provisions allowing state agencies to assign liquidated and delinquent accounts to private collection agencies. Specifies that Collections Unit of department has access to all information available to department for any purpose. Specifies when state agency may use Social Security number for debt collection purposes.
Title
Relating to state agency debt collection.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Accountability. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |