OR SB883 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes definition of "enforcing agency" from city or county dog licensing agency or other designated agency to State Veterinarian for purposes of regulating animal rescue entities. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to State Department of Agriculture and increases limitation on expenditures by department for biennium beginning July 1, 2019, for purposes of enforcing and regulating animal rescue entities.
Title
Relating to animal rescue entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 557, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Chapter 557, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Neron. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 21--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Evans, Findley, Helt, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 1--Leif; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Hernandez, Marsh. |
2019-06-17 | House | Carried over to June 18, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-06-13 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |