OR SB863 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Effective date, April 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits marijuana retailers from recording, retaining and transferring type of information that is contained on passport, driver license, military identification card or other identification card that bears picture of person. Prohibits marijuana retailers and medical marijuana dispensaries from retaining identification information of consumers and registry identification cardholders for more than 48 hours after close of business on business day on which marijuana retailer or medical marijuana dispensary acquired information.] Prohibits marijuana retailers and medical marijuana dispensaries from transferring to any other person identification information of consumers and registry identification cardholders.] Creates exemptions. Requires marijuana retailer to destroy type of information that is contained on passport, driver license, military identification card or other identification card that bears picture of person that is in retailer's possession on effective date of Act not later than 30 days after effective date of Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to cannabis; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26SenateEffective date, April 17, 2017.
2017-04-26SenateChapter 018, 2017 Laws.
2017-04-19SenateGovernor signed.
2017-04-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-04-11SenatePresident signed.
2017-04-10HouseThird reading. Carried by Wilson. Passed.Ayes, 53; Nays, 5--Barreto, Nearman, Noble, Post, Sprenger; Excused, 2--Boone, Piluso.
2017-04-06HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2017 Calendar.
2017-04-05HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2017 Calendar.
2017-04-04HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2017 Calendar.
2017-04-03HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 4, 2017 Calendar.
2017-03-30HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 3, 2017 Calendar.
2017-03-29HouseRules suspended. Carried over to March 30, 2017 Calendar.
2017-03-28HouseSecond reading.
2017-03-27HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2017-03-24HouseReferred to Marijuana Regulation.
2017-03-22HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2017-03-21SenateThird reading. Carried by Ferrioli. Passed.Ayes, 21; nays, 6--Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Olsen, Thomsen; excused, 3--DeBoer, Frederick, Thatcher.
2017-03-20SenateSecond reading.
2017-03-17SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2017-03-14SenateWork Session held.
2017-03-07SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2017-03-01SenateReferred to Marijuana Regulation.
2017-02-23SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback