OR SB861 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires state to pay for ballot return envelopes that can be returned by business reply mail, or other mailing service determined by Secretary of State to be more cost effective or efficient, for each election held in this state. Applies to elections held on or after January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to elections; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-30HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Speaker Kotek.
2019-06-30HouseThird reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 17--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Findley, Gomberg, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Post, Reardon, Reschke, Smith G, Speaker Kotek, Stark, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 4--Clem, Noble, Sprenger, Wallan.
2019-06-29HouseRules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 30, 2019 Calendar.
2019-06-29HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2019-06-29HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-06-29HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-29HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-06-29SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boles, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
2019-06-29SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-21SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2019-06-20SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-19SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-19SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-14SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2019-03-25SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2019-03-25SenateRecommendation: Do Pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-03-18SenateWork Session held.
2019-03-11SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-26SenateReferred to Rules.
2019-02-26SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB861
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB861/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB861/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB861/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB861/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB861/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB861/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28209
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30122
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=477653
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=478259

Bill Comments

feedback