OR SB86 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes licensing agency to revoke, suspend, impose conditions on or refuse to renew license to operate residential training facility or residential training home under specified conditions and to consider performance and experience of applicant or licensee in other states or jurisdictions. Authorizes licensing agency to revoke, suspend, impose conditions on or refuse to renew license to operate residential training facility or residential training home under specified conditions and to consider performance and experience of applicant or licensee in other states or jurisdictions. Requires agency to adopt rules for imposition of conditions.
Title
Relating to licensing of residential facilities.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 316, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 3--Clem, Nearman, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-28 | House | Carried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-04-07 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Johnson, Thatcher. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |