OR SB856 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services to sell Timms Hamby Computer Archive Center to Harney County for consideration of $1.
Title
Relating to local finance; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session scheduled. |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |