OR SB85 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on June 3 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies family-based group home placements to permit respite time for providers. Modifies family-based group home placements to permit respite time for providers. Modifies direction to Department of Human Services regarding development of process for review of out-of-state placements. Permits secure transportation of child without department employee in certain emergencies. Modifies provisions of law relating to placement of juvenile offenders in out-of-state child-caring agencies. Permits placement of wards 18 years of age or older in certain facilities. Modifies description of residential treatment program. Modifies certain requirements for reports of out-of-state placements. Directs department to submit annual reports for two years to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to human services regarding certain children or wards placed in temporary lodgings. Declares that person may not be disqualified from service as child welfare service provider based on certain traits. Declares that child, ward or youth may not be prohibited from, disciplined for or retaliated against for publicly or privately speaking about child's, ward's or youth's experience receiving child welfare services. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to children; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-09SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-08SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-06-08SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard.
2021-06-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 48; Excused, 6--Alonso Leon, Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Smith DB, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 6--Drazan, Holvey, Rayfield, Sanchez, Speaker Kotek, Wallan.
2021-06-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-01HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-27HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2021-05-19HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-12HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Human Services.
2021-04-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-22SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Frederick, Heard.
2021-04-21SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-19SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-04-08SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-01SenateWork Session not held.
2021-02-18SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-16SenatePublic Hearing Cancelled.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB85
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB85/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB85/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB85/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB85/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB85/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB85/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31916
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=517344
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32569
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=527350
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=528379

Bill Comments 750

feedback