OR SB844 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Effective date, August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Effective date, August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Department of Corrections to collect portion of certain moneys in inmate trust account for transitional fund and payment of court-ordered financial obligations. Directs Department of Justice and Judicial Department to provide Department of Corrections with accounting of court-ordered financial obligations. Specifies procedures for collection and disbursement of moneys and prioritization of payments. Appropriates moneys to Department of Corrections, and increases limitation on expenditures by department, for purposes of upgrading inmate trust accounting system. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to inmate trust account moneys; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | Senate | Effective date, August 8, 2017. |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Chapter 692, 2017 Laws. |
2017-08-08 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-07 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Keny-Guyer, Parrish, Sanchez; Excused, 1--Hayden. |
2017-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to July 7, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-07-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 3--Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |