OR SB844 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Effective date, August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Task Force on Researching the Medical and Public Health Properties of Cannabis for purpose of studying and making report, including recommendations for legislation, on development of medical cannabis industry that provides patients with medical products that meet individual patient needs. Specifies that premises licensed by Oregon Liquor Control Commission may receive marijuana items only from marijuana producer, marijuana processor or marijuana wholesaler operating as business at licensed premises.] Sunsets task force on December 31, 2017. Allows person convicted of marijuana crime, who when under 21 years of age was adjudicated by juvenile court or sentenced by court, to seek expunction or setting aside of conviction, as appropriate, after one year from date on which person fully complied with and performed conditions of adjudication or sentence. Makes certain changes to Oregon Medical Marijuana Act related to care of registry identification cardholders. Becomes operative March 1, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to marijuana; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-13SenateEffective date, August 12, 2015.
2015-08-13SenateChapter 844, 2015 Laws.
2015-08-12SenateGovernor signed.
2015-07-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-07SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-06HouseThird reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed.Ayes, 45; Nays, 14--Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hayden, Johnson, Krieger, McLane, Parrish, Post, Smith, Sprenger, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Buehler.
2015-07-03HouseSecond reading.
2015-07-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-07-02HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-07-02HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2015-07-02SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 21; nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Olsen.
2015-07-01SenateSecond reading.
2015-07-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2015-06-30SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-29SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-29SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-28SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2015-06-25SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2015-06-25SenateRecommendation: Do Pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2015-06-23SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-18SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-05-11SenateWork Session held.
2015-05-06SenateWork Session cancelled.
2015-05-04SenateWork Session held.
2015-04-29SenateWork Session held.
2015-04-27SenateWork Session held.
2015-04-20SenatePossible Work Session cancelled.
2015-04-15SenatePossible Work Session cancelled.
2015-04-13SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-04-01SenateWork Session held.
2015-03-25SenateWork Session held.
2015-03-23SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-03-05SenateReferred to Implementing Measure 91.
2015-03-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback