OR SB837 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred to Revenue.
Pending: House Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes, during five assessment years following correction of real market value by Department of Revenue or tribunal, change to real market value indicated by subsequent sale of property. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to corrections of real market value; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseReferred to Revenue.
2019-04-10HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-04-09SenateThird reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Girod, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Hansell.
2019-04-08SenateSecond reading.
2019-04-08SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-04-02SenateWork Session held.
2019-03-07SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-26SenateReferred to Finance and Revenue.
2019-02-26SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback