OR SB823 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Human Services to prepare completed abuse investigation report at conclusion of specified child abuse investigations. Requires disclosure, in response to public records request, of reports of investigations of child abuse occurring at specified state-authorized programs. Exempts specified information and documents.] Directs Department of Human Services to prepare completed abuse investigation report at conclusion of specified child abuse investigations. Exempts completed abuse investigation reports from disclosure in response to public records requests. Creates exceptions. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to records of investigations of child abuse occurring in state programs; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-05-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-20 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services. |
2023-04-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser Blouin. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 7--Bonham, Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 2--Findley, Gorsek. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Carried over to 04-17 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |