OR SB820 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-17)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-17)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows nonresident veterans discharged under honorable conditions to pay tuition and fees at Oregon resident rates.
Title
Relating to veterans' educational benefits; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Education and Workforce Development by prior reference. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness, then Education and Workforce Development. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |