OR SB813 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Effective date, July 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Effective date, July 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies applicability of provisions extending time to commence action or give notice of claim when expiration of time falls within state of emergency related to COVID-19. Directs State Court Administrator to study civil proceedings. Requires report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary.] Sunsets January 2, 2023.] Clarifies applicability of provisions extending time to commence action or give notice of claim when expiration of time falls within state of emergency related to COVID-19. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to civil proceedings; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-18 | Senate | Effective date, July 14, 2021. |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Chapter 499, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 1--Cate; Excused, 2--Nearman, Williams; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Fahey, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-05-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 8--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Heard, Johnson, President Courtney. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |