OR SB810 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definition of "vulnerable user of a public way" to include persons operating or riding on moped or motorcycle.
Title
Relating to vulnerable users of public ways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 349, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 3--Boles, Keny-Guyer, Smith DB; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Doherty, Speaker Kotek. |
2019-05-30 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Linthicum, Olsen; Excused, 2--Heard, Winters. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |