OR SB810 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Oregon Health Savings Account program in office of State Treasurer to enable Oregon taxpayers to reduce taxable income by making contributions to program that reimburses taxpayers' qualified medical expenses. Allows subtraction of contributions to Oregon Health Savings Account program from federal taxable income for state personal income tax purposes up to specified limits. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health savings accounts; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-07SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2017-03-28SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-02-17SenateReferred to Health Care, then Finance and Revenue.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback