OR SB808 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Health Authority and specified professional regulatory boards to require licensees regulated by authority or board to complete continuing education related to suicide risk assessment, treatment and management and to report completion of continuing education to authority or board. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to continuing education for professionals; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means and requesting referral to Rules (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded and refer to Rules. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Health Care, then Ways and Means. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |