OR SB808 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that with respect to newborn screening, Oregon Health Authority shall specify that person providing newborn screening may conduct tests for conditions listed on most recent edition of Recommended Uniform Screening Panel by United States Department of Health and Human Services. Specifies that person providing newborn screening shall test for certain condition through implementation of laboratory developed test approved by federal Food and Drug Administration, under certain circumstances. Establishes Review Committee on Newborn Screening for purposes of studying, evaluating and making proposals related to newborn screening. Sunsets committee on December 31, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to screening newborns; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |