OR SB805 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-22 - Effective date, June 17, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to egg-laying hens; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to egg-laying hens; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-22 Effective date, June 17, 2011.
2011-06-22 Chapter 436, 2011 Laws.
2011-06-17 Governor signed.
2011-06-13 Co-Speakers signed.
2011-06-07 President signed.
2011-06-06 Third reading. Carried by McLane. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 8--Dembrow, Freeman, Krieger, Parrish, Thatcher, Weidner, Witt, Speaker Hanna; Excused, 1--Tomei.
2011-06-02 Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2011 Calendar.
2011-06-01 Rules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2011 Calendar.
2011-05-31 Second reading.
2011-05-27 Recommendation: Do pass.
2011-05-26 Referred to Ways and Means.
2011-05-26 First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers.
2011-05-25 Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 4--Boquist, George, Kruse, Starr.
2011-05-24 Second reading.
2011-05-23 Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2011-05-20 Work Session held.
2011-05-11 Returned to Full Committee.
2011-05-11 Work Session held.
2011-05-05 Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
2011-04-25 Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2011-04-25 Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2011-04-19 Work Session held.
2011-03-31 Public Hearing held.
2011-03-29 Public Hearing held.
2011-02-25 Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
2011-02-22 Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback