OR SB800 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-10)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-10)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Effective date, January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to education.
Title
Relating to education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Effective date, January 1, 2012. | |
2011-06-09 | Chapter 313, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-06-09 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-02 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-26 | President signed. | |
2011-05-24 | Third reading. Carried by Wingard. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Frederick; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bailey. | |
2011-05-23 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-20 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-05-18 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-09 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-18 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-04-13 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-04-12 | Third reading. Carried by Bonamici. Passed. Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Boquist. | |
2011-04-11 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-11 | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. | |
2011-04-11 | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. | |
2011-04-05 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-22 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Education and Workforce Development, then Ways and Means. | |
2011-02-22 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |