OR SB80 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Effective date, August 4, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Effective date, August 4, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes certain changes related to statewide wildfire hazard map. Makes certain changes related to statewide wildfire hazard map. Instructs State Board of Forestry to establish four classes of] Makes certain changes related to wildland-urban interface. Establishes certain requirements for financial assistance related to defensible space. Establishes Landscape Resiliency Fund in State Treasury, separate and distinct from General Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to State Forestry Department for purposes related to landscape resiliency. Specifies permissible sources of moneys in Community Risk Reduction Fund. Makes certain changes related to cleaner air spaces. Makes certain changes related to Wildfire Programs Advisory Council. Directs Department of State Fire Marshal to establish and implement Wildfire Home Preparedness Program.] Instructs State Forestry Department to establish Prescribed Fire Liability Pilot Program. Sunsets program on January 2, 2028. Establishes Prescribed Fire Claims Fund in State Treasury, separate and distinct from General Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to Department of Consumer and Business Services for reimbursing claims under program. Instructs State Forestry Department to report to Governor and committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to natural resources on program on or before April 1, 2028. Appropriates moneys to Department of State Fire Marshal for purposes related to Wildfire Home Preparedness Program] deposit in Community Risk Reduction Fund. Establishes maximum limit for payment of expenses through fund. Appropriates moneys to State Forestry Department and Higher Education Coordinating Commission for purposes related to statewide wildfire hazard map or wildland-urban interface. Establishes maximum limit for payment of expenses from Prescribed Fire Claims Fund. Appropriates moneys to State Forestry Department for administration of Prescribed Fire Liability Pilot Program. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to wildfire; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-22 | Senate | Effective date, August 4, 2023. |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Chapter 611, 2023 Laws. |
2023-08-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-06-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-21 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Pham K. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 12--Boice, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Conrad, Elmer, Goodwin, Hieb, Lewis, McIntire, Morgan, Stout, Wallan; Excused, 10--Boshart Davis, Cramer, Diehl, Levy B, Lively, Nguyen D, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Rayfield. |
2023-06-21 | House | Second reading. |
2023-06-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-06-20 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-06-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Knopp. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 2--Bonham, Smith DB; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |