OR SB80 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain tax-related documents to be delivered or made available by method other than regular mail. Authorizes Department of Revenue to give oil and gas production taxpayer notice of tax and delinquency charges by regular mail or other form of delivery rather than registered mail or certified mail with return receipt. Requires department to provide small tract forestland owner with notice of requirement to file timber severance tax return and to make severance tax return form available. Requires department to provide notice by mail unless owner elects alternative method allowed by department. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax-related document delivery; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Senate | Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Chapter 360, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 56; Absent, 1--Neron; Excused, 2--Hernandez, Speaker Kotek; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Barker. |
2019-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Olsen, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Beyer, Knopp. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |