OR SB785 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes legislative findings regarding routine provision of antibiotics to food-producing animals and its relation to public health. Prohibits provision of medically important antibiotic to food-producing animal except as recommended by licensed veterinarian for certain purposes. Makes prohibition operative January 1, 2019. Requires operator of concentrated animal feeding operation to file annual report regarding provision of medically important antibiotics to food-producing animals at operation. Requires reporting for activities conducted on or after January 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to protecting antibiotics for human public health; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-07SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2017-03-16SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-02-13SenateReferred to Health Care.
2017-02-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback