OR SB784 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes public utility to seek rate recovery for operating expenses and capital costs associated with resiliency measures from retail electricity consumers or natural gas consumers. Authorizes public utility to seek rate recovery for operating expenses and capital costs associated with resiliency measures from retail electricity consumers or natural gas consumers. Directs Public Utility Commission to establish voluntary emission reduction program for public utilities that furnish natural gas. Authorizes electric company to include as part of portfolio of rate options, program of rates or charges reflecting costs of serving retail electricity consumers within boundaries of local governments with electricity derived from renewable energy sources or paired with unbundled renewable energy certificates. Requires Public Utility Commission to allow recovery of certain social and environmental costs from retail electricity consumers receiving electricity from electricity service suppliers.] Modifies certain laws related to competitive retail market for electricity. Requires responsible contractor labor standards for] in construction or repowering of large-scale renewable energy generation or storage facilities or large-scale renewable natural gas processing facilities.
Title
Relating to energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |