OR SB784 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Public Employees Retirement Board to exclude amounts exceeding $100,000 of salary paid or earned in any year in computing final average salary for purposes of retirement benefits. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to capping final average salary for purposes of the Oregon Public Service Retirement Plan; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Rep. Gail Whitsett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Workforce failed.Ayes, 10; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney; excused, 2--Thatcher, Winters. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB784 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB784/Introduced |