OR SB78 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Referred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Rules.
Pending: House Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Oregon Racing Commission to adopt rules related to issuance of licenses to conduct off-race course simulcast mutuel wagering. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to racing; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Rules.
2019-02-25HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-02-21SenateThird reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Thatcher; Excused, 2--Beyer, Knopp.
2019-02-19SenateSecond reading.
2019-02-19SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-02-12SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-02-05SenatePublic Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled.
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Business and General Government.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback