OR SB78 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to compassionate release of prisoners; prescribing an effective date; providing for criminal sentence reduction that requires approval by a two-thirds majority.
Title
Relating to compassionate release of prisoners; prescribing an effective date; providing for criminal sentence reduction that requires approval by a two-thirds majority.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Rules by prior reference. | |
2011-04-29 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Rules by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-04-19 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-18 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-13 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-01 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Judiciary, then Rules. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |