OR SB777 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Effective date, October 5, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Oregon 529 Savings Board to establish by rule qualified state ABLE Act program as described in federal Stephen Beck, Jr., Achieving a Better Life Experience Act of 2014. Allows persons with disabilities to establish savings accounts for disability-related expenses. Excludes distributions from account for qualified disability expenses from federal taxable income. Subtracts contributions made to account from federal taxable income when contribution is made before designated beneficiary of account attains 21 years of age. Allows state without qualified ABLE program to contract with this state to provide residents of contracting state access to Oregon ABLE program. Specifies that amount in ABLE account is disregarded for purposes of determining person's financial eligibility to receive assistance or benefit authorized by law. Establishes Oregon 529 College Savings Plan Subaccount and Oregon 529 ABLE Subaccount in Oregon 529 Savings Network Fund. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to State Treasurer for establishment of ABLE program. Directs State Treasurer to transfer amount of appropriation from Oregon 529 ABLE Subaccount to General Fund as soon as practicable. Directs State Treasurer and Oregon 529 Savings Board to establish qualified ABLE program not later than January 1, 2017. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to savings accounts for disability-related expenses; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Printed B-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Finance and Revenue by prior reference and requesting referral to Ways and Means. Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-13SenateEffective date, October 5, 2015.
2015-08-13SenateChapter 843, 2015 Laws.
2015-08-12SenateGovernor signed.
2015-07-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-07SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-03SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Olsen.
2015-07-02HouseThird reading. Carried by Komp, Hayden. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 2--Barton, Greenlick; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Clem, Gomberg, McLane.
2015-07-01HouseSecond reading.
2015-07-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed D-Engrossed.
2015-06-30HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-24HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-06-24HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2015-06-23SenateJohnson, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye.
2015-06-23SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Beyer, Olsen.
2015-06-22SenateSecond reading.
2015-06-18SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill. (Printed C-Eng.)
2015-06-16SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-11SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-11SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-02SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-05-27SenatePublic Hearing Cancelled.
2015-05-19SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
2015-04-27SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed B-Eng.)
2015-04-21SenateWork Session held.
2015-04-15SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-04-07SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior and then Ways and Means by order of the President(Printed A-Eng.)
2015-04-02SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-02-26SenateReferred to Human Services and Early Childhood, then Finance and Revenue.
2015-02-24SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB777
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB777/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB777/Senate%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB777/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB777/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB777/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB777/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB777/C-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB777/House%20Amendments%20to%20C-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB777/D-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB777/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21381
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21948
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23051
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=361260
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364048
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364480

Bill Comments

feedback