OR SB777 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies meeting requirements for Pharmacy and Therapeutics Committee of Oregon Health Authority.
Title
Relating to drug reviews by the Oregon Health Authority; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-05-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2013-04-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Johnson, Shields, Winters. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |