OR SB774 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Effective date, July 27, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Home Care Commission to adopt statewide plan to expand home care worker workforce. Encourages Department of Human Services to implement single online application for inclusion on registry maintained by commission and to assign unique] universal provider numbers to home care workers. Requires commission to convene work group to address] charge subcommittee of commission with addressing specified issues related to home care workers and to report findings of subcommittee to Legislative Assembly no later than November 16, 2015. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Home Care Commission; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2015-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-28SenateEffective date, July 27, 2015.
2015-07-28SenateChapter 796, 2015 Laws.
2015-07-27SenateGovernor signed.
2015-07-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-07SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-06HouseThird reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed.Ayes, 44; Nays, 15--Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Gilliam, Heard, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Sprenger, Weidner, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 1--Buehler.
2015-07-03HouseSecond reading.
2015-07-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-07-02HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-07-02HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2015-07-02SenateDembrow, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye.
2015-07-02SenateThird reading. Carried by Bates. Passed.Ayes, 19; nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Olsen.
2015-07-01SenateSecond reading.
2015-06-30SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2015-06-29SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-23SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-23SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-17SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2015-04-28SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2015-04-28SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2015-04-21SenateWork Session held.
2015-04-09SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-03-06SenateReferred to Human Services and Early Childhood.
2015-02-26SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB774
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB774/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB774/Senate%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB774/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB774/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB774/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB774/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/22002
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23299
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364058
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364918

Bill Comments

feedback