OR SB770 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Task Force on Universal Health Care charged with recommending to Legislative Assembly design of Health Care for All Oregon Plan, administered by Health Care for All Oregon Board to provide publicly funded, equitable, affordable, comprehensive and high quality health care to all Oregon residents. Establishes Task Force on Universal Health Care Commission] charged with recommending to Legislative Assembly design of Health Care for All Oregon Plan, administered by Health Care for All Oregon Board to provide publicly funded, equitable, affordable, comprehensive and high quality health care to all Oregon residents. Specifies membership and duties of commission] task force. Requires recommendations to be guided by specified values and principles. Prescribes requirements for plan design and items that commission] task force must consider. Requires commission to first meet by November 1, 2019, and provide first report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health by March 15, 2020. Requires commission] members of task force to be appointed by May 31, 2020, and task force to submit to 2021 regular session of Legislative Assembly final recommendations by February 1, 2021, or report on work that remains to be completed] for design of Health Care for All Oregon Plan and Health Care for All Oregon Board. Requires Oregon Health Authority to develop plan for Medicaid Buy-In program. Specifies elements that must be included in plan, to extent feasible. Requires authority to provide report to Legislative Assembly, no later than May 1, 2020, containing discussion of potential eligibility requirements for Medicaid Buy-In program or public option, options for targeting specified groups, recommendations for legislative changes necessary to implement plan and any federal approval that would be required to implement plan. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to statewide health care coverage; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-30HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nosse, Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 18--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 4--Clem, Noble, Sprenger, Wallan.
2019-06-30HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2019-06-30HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-06-30HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-30HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-06-30SenateGelser, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye.
2019-06-30SenateThird reading. Carried by Manning Jr, Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boles, Hansell, Heard, Knopp, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum.
2019-06-29SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-21SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2019-06-18SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-17SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-17SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-14SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2019-04-16SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-04-16SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-04-08SenateWork Session held.
2019-04-03SenateWork Session held.
2019-04-01SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Health Care, then Ways and Means.
2019-02-12SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB770
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB770/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB770/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB770/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB770/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB770/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB770/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28836
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30079
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=478180
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=478269

Bill Comments

feedback