OR SB767 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows signature of judgment creditor or attorney signing satisfaction document to be notarized or accompanied by declaration under penalty of perjury. Allows signature of judgment creditor or attorney signing satisfaction document to be notarized or accompanied by declaration under penalty of perjury. Modifies requirements for filing small claims action in justice court. Allows statement of claim to be attested by affidavit or by declaration under penalty of perjury. Allows defendant to enter plea of no contest to violation citation by entering plea with Violations Bureau established by court.
Title
Relating to courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Chapter 411, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 3--Grayber, Hayden, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Drazan, Smith G, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-17 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-05-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Civil Law. |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-04-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 9--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |