OR SB764 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Relating to alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-05-10 | Referred to Business and Labor. | |
2011-05-03 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-05-02 | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 19; nays, 11--Boquist, Burdick, Dingfelder, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Kruse, Olsen, Telfer, Thomsen, Whitsett. | |
2011-04-28 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-27 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-04-21 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-17 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Business, Transportation and Economic Development. | |
2011-02-17 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |