OR SB762 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Public Utility Commission to convene workshops. Directs Public Utility Commission to convene workshops. Requires public utility that provides electricity to have wildfire protection plan. Provides that violation is subject to civil penalty not to exceed $10,000. Requires consumer-owned utility to have wildfire mitigation plan. Directs State Board of Forestry to establish criteria for developing statewide map of wildfire risk, establish Certified Burn Manager program and report to Legislative Assembly on or before December 1, 2021. Directs State Fire Marshal to establish defensible space requirements, administer community risk reduction program and biannually report to Legislative Assembly, State Wildfire Programs Director and Wildfire Programs Advisory Council. Establishes Community Risk Reduction Fund in State Treasury. Directs Department of Land Conservation and Development to identify certain land use updates and report to Legislative Assembly, State Wildfire Programs Director and Wildfire Programs Advisory Council on or before October 1, 2022. Directs Department of Consumer and Business Services to adopt certain building code standards. Directs Department of Environmental Quality to undertake programs concerning impacts of wildfire smoke, readiness and mitigation capacity for smoke and ambient air quality. Directs Department of Human Services to establish grant program related to clean air shelters and smoke filtration systems and report to Legislative Assembly, State Wildfire Programs Director and Wildfire Programs Advisory Council no later than June 30, 2023. Directs Office of Emergency Management to update statewide emergency plan to prepare for or respond to wildfire emergencies. Directs State Forestry Department to implement program to reduce wildfire risk, report to Legislative Assembly, Governor, State Wildfire Programs Director and Wildfire Programs Advisory Council no later than January 15, 2022, and July 15, 2023, establish small forestland grant program, adopt certain rules concerning prescribed fires, establish system of smoke detection cameras and assess and improve wildfire response capacity. Establishes Oregon Conservation Corps Program and Oregon Conservation Corps Advisory Committee. Establishes Oregon Conservation Corps Fund in State Treasury. Makes certain changes concerning wildland-urban interface. Directs Governor to appoint State Wildfire Programs Director. Establishes Wildfire Programs Advisory Council. Requires council to annually report to Governor and Legislative Assembly. For certain entities, for specified purposes, appropriates moneys from General Fund, increases appropriations from General Fund and increases limitations on expenditures. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to wildfire; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Motion to Refer (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Motion to Refer (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, July 19, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 592, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-07-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 6--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Reschke, Stark, Wallan; Excused, 4--Hayden, Morgan, Smith G, Weber. |
2021-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-25 | House | Referred to SB 762. |
2021-06-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Girod declared potential conflict of interest. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 7--Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill. (Printed C-Eng.) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Motion to refer to Committee on SB 762 carried. Ayes, 23; Nays, 5--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Burdick, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended, read third time. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Informational Meeting held. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |