OR SB761 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that only elector who has personally printed copy, or requested that separate person print copy, of electronic signature sheet for petition or prospective petition may sign signature sheet. Requires that only elector who has personally printed copy, or requested that separate person print copy, of electronic signature sheet for petition or prospective petition may sign signature sheet. Requires elector to certify that elector received electronic signature sheet in compliance with requirement. Requires template for electronic signature sheet to include final measure summary, ballot title and full and correct copy of measure to be initiated or referred. Prohibits future use of electronic signature sheets for particular petition or prospective petition if Secretary of State determines that one or more electors who have not personally printed electronic signature sheet have signed and submitted sheet to secretary.].

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to electronic signature sheets.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 10 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-30HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Mitchell.
2019-06-30HouseThird reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 33; Nays, 22--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Drazan, Evans, Findley, Gomberg, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Post, Rayfield, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 4--Clem, Noble, Sprenger, Wallan.
2019-06-29HouseRules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 30, 2019 Calendar.
2019-06-29HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-29HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-06-29HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-20HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-06-19HouseReferred to Rules.
2019-06-19HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-06-19SenateVote explanation filed by Boquist.
2019-06-19SenateThird reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Bentz.
2019-06-19SenateMotion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 10; Nays, 18--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Fagan, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Hass, Johnson, Manning Jr, Monnes Anderson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner; Excused, 1--Bentz.
2019-06-18SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-17Senate(Not concurring: Boquist, Baertschiger)
2019-06-17SenateMinority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments. (Printed A-Eng. Minority)
2019-06-17SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng).
2019-06-12SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-20SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-13SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Rules.
2019-02-07SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB761
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB761/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB761/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB761/Senate%20Minority%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB761/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB761/Minority%20Report%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB761/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29934
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=476214
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=476235
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30221
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=478257

Bill Comments

feedback