OR SB751 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits form of marriage application, license or record from requiring address for entity authorized to solemnize marriage.
Title
Relating to documents related to marriage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-04 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Chapter 466, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 44; Nays, 7--Barreto, Esquivel, Johnson, Lewis, Olson, Post, Reschke; Excused, 7--Bentz, Boone, Helm, McLane, Noble, Smith G, Witt; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Huffman, Nathanson. |
2017-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-31 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-03-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 17; nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen, Winters; excused, 3--Boquist, DeBoer, Thatcher. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Taken from 03-21 Calendar and placed on 03-23 Calendar on voice vote. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |