OR SB744 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Effective date, July 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Education to review state requirements for high school diploma and to make recommendations related to requirements. Directs Department of Education to review state requirements for high school diploma and to make recommendations related to requirements. Requires department to provide report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to education and to State Board of Education. Suspends requirement of showing proficiency in Essential Learning Skills as condition of earning diploma during 2021-2022, or] 2022-2023 or 2023-2024 school year. Prohibits State Board of Education from requiring for high school diploma that student show proficiency in any academic content area if student successfully completed credit requirements. Applies to high school diplomas awarded on or after July 1, 2023.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to high school diploma requirements; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-18SenateEffective date, July 14, 2021.
2021-08-18SenateChapter 495, 2021 Laws.
2021-07-14SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-22HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-22SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-16SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 16; Nays, 13--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
2021-06-14HouseThird reading. Carried by Neron. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 18--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Levy, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 3--Hayden, Lewis, Valderrama.
2021-06-10HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-08HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-07HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2021-05-27HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-25HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-13HouseInformational Meeting held.
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Education.
2021-04-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-21SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 12--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Frederick, Heard.
2021-04-19SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-03-31SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-03SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-10SenateReferred to Education.
2021-02-04SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB744
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB744/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB744/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB744/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB744/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB744/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB744/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31699
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=517162
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32740
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=530304
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=531130

Bill Comments

feedback