OR SB74 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits registered nurses and licensed practical nurses to execute medical treatment orders from certain other nurses and licensed health care providers.
Title
Relating to nursing.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Committee Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Committee Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Chapter 132, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-05-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-10 | House | Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed.Ayes, 53; Absent, 1--Nearman; Excused, 3--Gorsek, Johnson, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Rayfield, Smith Warner, Williamson. |
2017-05-08 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be placed on Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-02-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Carried over to 02-14 by unanimous consent. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |