OR SB739 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Higher Education Coordinating Commission for distribution to University of Oregon for program that strives to improve high school graduation rates through collaborative partnerships between university faculty and high school teachers. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to partnerships to improve high school graduation rates; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and be referred to Student Success and to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Student Success then to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Student Success and Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Student Success, then Ways and Means. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |