OR SB739 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Directs Department of Education to consult with specified entities when developing academic content standards for Oregon Studies and preparing materials to support teacher training and classroom instruction in Oregon Studies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Oregon Studies; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

Sen. Jackie Winters [R]Sen. Rod Monroe [D]Rep. Kevin Cameron [R]Sen. Alan Bates [D]
Sen. Leslee Beyer [D]Sen. Brian Boquist [R]Sen. Ginny Burdick [D]Rep. Betsy Close [R]
Sen. Peter Courtney [D]Sen. Richard Devlin [D]Sen. Jackie Dingfelder [D]Sen. Chris Edwards [D]
Sen. Ted Ferrioli [R]Sen. Lawrence George [R]Sen. Fred Girod [R]Sen. Bill Hansell [R]
Sen. Mark Hass [D]Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D]Sen. Tim Knopp [R]Sen. Jeff Kruse [R]
Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D]Sen. Alan Olsen [R]Sen. Floyd Prozanski [D]Sen. Arnie Roblan [D]
Sen. Diane Rosenbaum [D]Sen. William Shields [D]Sen. Bruce Starr [R]Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D]
Sen. Chuck Thomsen [R]Sen. Douglas Whitsett [R]Sen. Herman Baertschiger [R]Rep. Jeff Barker [D]
Rep. Philip Barnhart [D]Rep. Brent Barton [D]Sen. Cliff Bentz [R]Rep. Vicki Berger [R]
Rep. Deborah Boone [D]Sen. Michael Dembrow [D]Rep. Margaret Doherty [D]Sen. Shemia Fagan [D]
Sen. Lew Frederick [D]Rep. Tim Freeman [R]Rep. Christopher Garrett [D]Rep. Vic Gilliam [R]
Sen. Chris Gorsek [D]Rep. Bruce Hanna [R]Rep. Chris Harker [D]Rep. Matthew Hicks [R]
Rep. Paul Holvey [D]Rep. Val Hoyle [D]Rep. Robert Jenson [R]Rep. Mark Johnson [R]
Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D]Rep. Betty Komp [D]Rep. Tina Kotek [D]Rep. Wayne Krieger [R]
Rep. Greg Matthews [D]Rep. Caddy McKeown [D]Rep. Mike McLane [R]Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D]
Rep. Andy Olson [R]Rep. Julie Parrish [R]Rep. Jeff Reardon [D]Rep. Dennis Richardson [R]
Sen. Lona Thatcher [R]Rep. Carolyn Tomei [D]Rep. Jim Weidner [R]Rep. Gail Whitsett [R]
Rep. Jennifer Williamson [D]Rep. Bradley Witt [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-21SenateEffective date, August 14, 2013.
2013-08-21SenateChapter 777, 2013 Laws.
2013-08-14SenateGovernor signed.
2013-07-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2013-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2013-07-01HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 2--Bailey, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Esquivel, McKeown, Witt.
2013-07-01HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2013-07-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2013-07-01HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2013-07-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2013-06-29SenateThird reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist.
2013-06-28SenateSecond reading.
2013-06-27SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2013-06-26SenateWork Session held.
2013-06-24SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2013-06-24SenateWork Session held.
2013-04-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2013-04-18SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Education.
2013-04-09SenateRecommendation: Do pass. Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2013-04-02SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2013-03-07SenateReferred to Education and Workforce Development.
2013-03-05SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback