OR SB723 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires agency, upon written request of 10 members of Legislative Assembly objecting to rule, to appear before appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly for hearing on rule. Requires agency, upon written request of 10 members of Legislative Assembly objecting to rule, to appear before appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly for hearing on rule.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to administrative rules.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-04-27SenateMotion to withdraw from committee on Rules failed. Ayes, 10; Nays, 15--Campos, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser Blouin, Golden, Jama, Lieber, Manning Jr, Meek, Patterson, Sollman, Steiner, Taylor, Woods, President Wagner; Excused, 5--Girod, Gorsek, Linthicum, Prozanski, Smith DB.
2023-01-13SenateReferred to Rules.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback