OR SB72 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes outdated application requirement for certain nurses applying to Oregon State Board of Nursing for authority to dispense prescription drugs.
Title
Relating to nursing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Committee Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Committee Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Chapter 130, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-05-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-10 | House | Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed.Ayes, 54; Excused, 3--Gorsek, Johnson, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Rayfield, Smith Warner, Williamson. |
2017-05-08 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be placed on Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-02-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Carried over to 02-14 by unanimous consent. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |