OR SB719 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to develop and provide system of supports and technical assistance for school districts that is related to abbreviated school day programs for students with individualized education program. Directs Department of Education to conduct evaluation and administer pilot program related to abbreviated school day programs.] Directs department to submit report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2020.] Sunsets December 31, 2020.] Prescribes requirements of system. Declares emergency, effective on passage] July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to abbreviated school days; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Student Success then to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Student Success then to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Student Success, then Ways and Means. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Student Success and then Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Student Success, then Ways and Means. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |