OR SB711 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Consumer and Business Services to study cost differences in hormone replacement drugs used by men and hormone replacement drugs used by women and report findings to Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Requires Department of Consumer and Business Services to study cost differences in hormone replacement drugs used by men and hormone replacement drugs used by women and report findings to Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Requires department to keep strictly confidential information submitted in accordance with prescription drug price transparency program that is collected, used or relied upon for study, if information is not already in public domain and is confidential, proprietary or trade secret. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to gender disparities in cost of pharmaceuticals; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Effective date, September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Chapter 407, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 21; Nays, 9--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2021-06-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 10--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Leif, Levy, Morgan, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith G, Stark; Excused, 3--Grayber, Hayden, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Evans. |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-04-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 11--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Frederick, Heard. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |