OR SB710 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Education for State School Fund. Limits biennial expenditures from lottery moneys allocated from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund to department for State School Fund. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by department for State School Fund. Specifies amounts department may spend for certain purposes from State School Fund. Specifies, for 2019 and 2020 fiscal years, total amount that department may spend from State School Fund. Transfers moneys from State School Fund to Local Option Equalization Grants Account. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Olsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Student Success, then Ways and Means. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB710 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB710/Introduced |