OR SB702 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Board of Education to review social studies standards. Directs State Board of Education to review social studies standards. Prescribes requirements for review.
Title
Relating to social studies standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Chapter 406, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Campos. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 16--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 3--Grayber, Hayden, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Evans. |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Education. |
2021-05-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 5--Girod, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 4--Boquist, Findley, Heard, Kennemer. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Motion to refer to Rules carried by voice vote. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |