OR SB690 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 526, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 526, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures for petitioning for and issuing Certificate of Good Standing. Limits eligibility to persons convicted of nonperson felony or Class A misdemeanor other than person Class A misdemeanor. Requires written verification of successful completion of supervision for certain applicants. Requires district attorney to notify court when person with certificate is convicted of new crime other than Class C misdemeanor. Creates violation offense if person knowingly presents revoked or invalid certificate. Punishes by maximum of $1,000 fine. Provides that in certain negligence actions valid certificate creates rebuttable presumption that employer was not negligent. Sunsets January 2, 2022.
Title
Relating to Certificates of Good Standing.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Rep. Julie Parrish [R] | Sen. James Manning [D] |
Sen. Bill Kennemer [R] | Rep. Ann Lininger [D] | Rep. Andy Olson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-04 | Senate | Chapter 526, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Winters. |
2017-06-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Bentz, Boone, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-07 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-06-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-05-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |