OR SB689 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Vetoed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Governor's veto message entered into Journal.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Governor's veto message entered into Journal.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reestablishes Task Force on Reentry, Employment and Housing. Requires report to Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2018. Sunsets task force on December 31, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Task Force on Reentry, Employment and Housing; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-15 | Senate | Governor's veto message entered into Journal. |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Governor vetoed. |
2017-07-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 1--McKeown. |
2017-07-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to July 6, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-07-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to July 5, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-30 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-06-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |